NE LB684 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to post-release supervision for Class IV felonies
Title
Change provisions relating to post-release supervision for Class IV felonies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB684 amended into LB686 by AM1737 |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 20, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37843 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB684.pdf |