NE LB680 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Blood name added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Blood name added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Parkinson’s Disease Registry Act
Title
Change provisions of the Parkinson’s Disease Registry Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Day [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 16, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |