NE LB68 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Clements name added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit certain regulation of firearms, ammunition, and firearm accessories by counties, cities, and villages as prescribed and create firearm offenses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit certain regulation of firearms, ammunition, and firearm accessories by counties, cities, and villages as prescribed and create firearm offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19LegislatureClements name added
2017-04-18LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER58 filed
2017-04-18LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER58
2017-04-12LegislatureChambers MO86 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed
2017-04-12LegislatureChambers MO85 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed
2017-04-12LegislatureChambers FA63 filed
2017-04-12LegislatureChambers FA62 filed
2017-04-12LegislatureChambers FA61 filed
2017-04-12LegislatureChambers FA60 filed
2017-04-12LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-04-12LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM630 adopted
2017-04-12LegislatureHilgers MO84 prevailed
2017-04-12LegislatureHilgers MO84 Invoke cloture filed
2017-04-12LegislatureMorfeld MO83 failed
2017-04-12LegislatureMorfeld MO83 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed
2017-04-12LegislatureChambers MO82 withdrawn
2017-04-12LegislatureChambers MO82 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed
2017-04-12LegislatureChambers MO70 failed
2017-04-12LegislatureChambers MO70 pending
2017-04-04LegislatureMurante FA56 filed
2017-04-04LegislatureSchumacher FA55 filed
2017-04-04LegislatureChambers MO71 withdrawn
2017-04-04LegislatureChambers MO71 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed
2017-04-04LegislatureChambers MO70 pending
2017-04-04LegislatureChambers MO70 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed
2017-04-04LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM630 pending
2017-04-03LegislatureBlood AM904 filed
2017-04-03LegislaturePansing Brooks AM899 filed
2017-04-03LegislatureBlood AM865 filed
2017-04-03LegislatureBaker AM890 filed
2017-03-23LegislatureMurante AM738 filed
2017-03-17LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM630 filed
2017-03-17LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM630
2017-02-28LegislatureHilgers priority bill
2017-01-17LegislatureBrasch name added
2017-01-13LegislatureChambers MO9 withdrawn
2017-01-13LegislatureChambers MO9 Reconsider the vote to rerefer the bill to Judiciary Committee filed
2017-01-13LegislatureChambers MO3 failed
2017-01-13LegislatureChambers MO3 pending
2017-01-11LegislatureHalloran name added
2017-01-11LegislatureKintner name added
2017-01-10LegislatureChambers MO3 Rerefer to Judiciary Committee filed
2017-01-09LegislatureBostelman name added
2017-01-09LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 10, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback