NE LB677 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Property Tax Credit Act and provide school district property tax relief aid
Title
Change provisions of the Property Tax Credit Act and provide school district property tax relief aid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2019 |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37757 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB677.pdf |