NE LB674 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB674 amended into LB944 by AM1699
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB674 amended into LB944 by AM1699
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent to appropriate funds to the Division of Aeronautics for the Civil Air Patrol
Title
State intent to appropriate funds to the Division of Aeronautics for the Civil Air Patrol
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB674 amended into LB944 by AM1699 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33952 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB674.pdf |