NE LB670 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1112 amended into LB670 by AM2874
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to the juvenile justice system

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to the juvenile justice system

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 37-4-8 (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB1112 amended into LB670 by AM2874
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB774 amended into LB670 by AM2093
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB673 amended into LB670 by AM2093
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB516 amended into LB670 by AM2093
2018-04-23LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 23, 2018
2018-04-18LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 18, 2018
2018-04-18LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-04-18LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 37-4-8
2018-04-18LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2018-04-10LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST67
2018-04-09LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-04-09LegislatureVargas AM2874 adopted
2018-04-09LegislatureVargas AM2874 filed
2018-04-09LegislatureEbke AM2822 adopted
2018-04-09LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER173 adopted
2018-04-05LegislatureEbke AM2822 filed
2018-04-05LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER173 filed
2018-04-05LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER173
2018-04-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-04-03LegislatureVargas AM2714 adopted
2018-04-03LegislatureJudiciary AM2093 adopted
2018-03-28LegislatureVargas AM2714 filed
2018-02-28LegislatureJudiciary AM2093 filed
2018-02-28LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2093
2018-02-20LegislatureJudiciary priority bill
2018-01-09LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 24, 2018
2018-01-08LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2018-01-03LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback