NE LB667 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-26 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change and eliminate provisions on taxes and fees on horseracing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change and eliminate provisions on taxes and fees on horseracing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-26LegislatureBill withdrawn
2017-01-26LegislatureHilkemann MO22 prevailed
2017-01-25LegislatureHilkemann MO22 Withdraw bill filed
2017-01-24LegislatureRereferred to General Affairs Committee
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback