NE LB665 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deny claims against the state
Title
Deny claims against the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |