NE LB649 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Nebraska Financial Innovation Act and provisions for controllable electronic records under the Uniform Commercial Code
Title
Adopt the Nebraska Financial Innovation Act and provisions for controllable electronic records under the Uniform Commercial Code
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Flood [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-2-1 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1018 adopted (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Legislature - Flood AM1278 adopted (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1018 adopted (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Legislature - Flood AM1278 adopted (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-2-1 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST34 |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER92 adopted |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER92 filed |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER92 |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1018 adopted |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1338 refiled |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1338 withdrawn |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1338 filed |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Flood AM1278 adopted |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Flood AM1278 filed |
2021-05-04 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1018 filed |
2021-05-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1018 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Lindstrom name added |
2021-04-26 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2021-04-23 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Flood priority bill |
2021-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |