NE LB648 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide powers and duties to the State Department of Education relating to the development of a workforce diploma program
Title
Provide powers and duties to the State Department of Education relating to the development of a workforce diploma program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB648 amended into LB705 by AM1468 |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | McDonnell AM814 filed |
2023-03-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |