NE LB648 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change penalty for public indecency
Title
Change penalty for public indecency
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Pirsch [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Legislature | Bill withdrawn |
2013-03-13 | Legislature | Pirsch MO20 prevailed |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | Pirsch MO20 Withdraw bill filed |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18468 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB648.pdf |