NE LB647 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Approved by Governor on May 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change judges' salaries

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change judges' salaries

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-1-6 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-1-6 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 22, 2017
2017-05-17LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 16, 2017
2017-05-16LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-16LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-1-6
2017-05-04LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-05-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-10LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2017-04-05LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-04-05LegislatureChambers MO73 withdrawn
2017-04-05LegislatureChambers MO73 Indefinitely postpone filed
2017-04-05LegislatureJudiciary AM290 adopted
2017-04-05LegislatureMurante MO72 withdrawn
2017-04-05LegislatureMurante MO72 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Section 3(f) filed
2017-03-13LegislatureSpeaker priority bill
2017-02-22LegislatureJudiciary AM290 filed
2017-02-22LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM290
2017-01-24LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 10, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback