NE LB645 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Add dyslexia for purposes of special education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Add dyslexia for purposes of special education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 10, 2017
2017-05-04LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 04, 2017
2017-05-04LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-04LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 46-0-3
2017-05-02LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-04-26LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-24LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2017-04-20LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-04-20LegislatureEducation AM106 adopted
2017-02-27LegislatureEducation AM106 filed
2017-02-27LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM106
2017-02-07LegislatureErdman name added
2017-01-31LegislatureHarr name added
2017-01-24LegislatureKolterman name added
2017-01-24LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 07, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2017-01-19LegislatureMcCollister name added
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback