NE LB643 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Lindstrom name added
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protect an individual liberty right to accept or decline a vaccination under a mandatory directive

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect an individual liberty right to accept or decline a vaccination under a mandatory directive

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04LegislatureLindstrom name added
2021-01-28LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 04, 2021
2021-01-22LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2021-01-20LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback