NE LB641 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Approved by Governor on April 29, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Approved by Governor on April 29, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide rights and duties for a person operating a manual or motorized wheelchair as prescribed
Title
Provide rights and duties for a person operating a manual or motorized wheelchair as prescribed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 29, 2015 |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Smith explanation of vote |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 23, 2015 |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM1233 withdrawn |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2015-04-14 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM1233 filed |
2015-04-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-04-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-04-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER56 adopted |
2015-03-25 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER56 filed |
2015-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER56 |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Garrett AM1000 withdrawn |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM719 adopted |
2015-03-23 | Legislature | Garrett AM1000 filed |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill |
2015-03-09 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM719 filed |
2015-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM719 |
2015-02-11 | Legislature | Davis name added |
2015-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |