NE LB640 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions related to early childhood education in the Tax Equity and Educational Opportunities Support Act
Title
Change provisions related to early childhood education in the Tax Equity and Educational Opportunities Support Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Day [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |