NE LB64 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the Department of Health and Human Services to provide notice in certain cases of child abuse and neglect
Title
Require the Department of Health and Human Services to provide notice in certain cases of child abuse and neglect
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Day [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-04-20 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-02-03 | Legislature | Hardin name added |
2023-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2023 |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |