NE LB637 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require an economic analysis of rules and regulations proposed by the Department of Environmental Quality
Title
Require an economic analysis of rules and regulations proposed by the Department of Environmental Quality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-04-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA52 filed |
2013-04-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA51 withdrawn |
2013-04-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA51 pending |
2013-04-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA51 filed |
2013-04-03 | Legislature | Sullivan name withdrawn |
2013-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-03-14 | Legislature | Wallman priority bill |
2013-02-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 20, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18873 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB637.pdf |