NE LB636 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Notice of hearing for March 04, 2021
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Mar 4 @ 1:30 pm in Room 1113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminate cash bail bonds, appearance bonds, and related provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminate cash bail bonds, appearance bonds, and related provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 04, 2021
2021-01-22LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-01-20LegislatureMcKinney name added
2021-01-20LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback