NE LB632A | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Larson AM1407 adopted |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Larson AM1407 filed |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33743 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB632A.pdf |