NE LB632 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Enrollment and Review ER89 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to the Nebraska Liquor Control Act and name the Music Licensing Agency Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to the Nebraska Liquor Control Act and name the Music Licensing Agency Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER89 filed
2017-05-11LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER89
2017-05-10LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-05-10LegislatureGeneral Affairs AM1303 adopted
2017-05-10LegislatureLarson MO129 withdrawn
2017-05-10LegislatureLarson MO129 Reconsider the vote on AM1350 filed
2017-05-10LegislatureBlood AM1350 adopted
2017-05-10LegislatureBlood AM1350 pending
2017-05-10LegislatureGeneral Affairs AM1303 pending
2017-05-08LegislatureGeneral Affairs AM1303 filed
2017-05-08LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1303
2017-05-05LegislatureBlood AM1350 filed
2017-05-05LegislatureLarson AM88 filed
2017-05-05LegislatureLarson AM87 filed
2017-05-04LegislatureLarson AM86 filed
2017-03-06LegislatureGeneral Affairs priority bill
2017-02-03LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 13, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to General Affairs Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback