NE LB627 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit discrimination based upon sexual orientation and gender identity
Title
Prohibit discrimination based upon sexual orientation and gender identity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-03-10 | Legislature | DeBoer name added |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2020-02-19 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks priority bill |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Motion to overrule the chair failed |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Chair ruled there had not been full and fair debate on the advancement of the bill |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Pending |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Pending |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Cavanaugh name added |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Pending |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37049 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB627.pdf |