NE LB626 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB626 amended into LB138 by AM1226
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB626 amended into LB138 by AM1226
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the position of veterans' workforce development coordinator in the Department of Labor
Title
Create the position of veterans' workforce development coordinator in the Department of Labor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB626 amended into LB138 by AM1226 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM768 filed |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM768 |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Lowe name added |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 27, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37686 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB626.pdf |