NE LB624 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 11, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 11, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Nebraska Tourism Commission
Title
Change provisions relating to the Nebraska Tourism Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-1-7 (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2402 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2402 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-1-7 |
2024-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER62 adopted |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER62 filed |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER62 |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | McDonnell AM688 withdrawn |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2402 adopted |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2402 filed |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Corrected Government, Military, and Veterans Affairs Amendment Filed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-04-18 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM688 filed |
2023-04-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM688 |
2023-03-08 | Legislature | McDonnell AM688 filed |
2023-02-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 09, 2023 |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |