NE LB622 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions and provide for pooled collateral under the Public Funds Deposit Security Act
Title
Change provisions and provide for pooled collateral under the Public Funds Deposit Security Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Legislature - Williams AM406 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Williams AM225 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Legislature - Williams AM406 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Williams AM225 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 07, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST8 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Williams AM406 adopted |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Williams AM340 withdrawn |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER24 adopted |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | Williams AM406 filed |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Williams AM340 filed |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER24 filed |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER24 |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Williams AM225 adopted |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Williams AM225 filed |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |