NE LB619 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit denial of coverage for mental health services delivered in a school
Title
Prohibit denial of coverage for mental health services delivered in a school
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Legislature - Kolowski AM957 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM287 adopted (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Legislature - Kolowski AM957 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM287 adopted (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Kolowski AM957 adopted |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Wayne MO43 withdrawn |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER51 adopted |
2019-03-28 | Legislature | Wayne MO43 Bracket until June 1, 2019 filed |
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Kolowski AM957 filed |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER51 filed |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER51 |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM287 adopted |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM287 filed |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM287 |
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Kolowski priority bill |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 05, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |