NE LB617 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB617 amended into LB92 by AM1880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB617 amended into LB92 by AM1880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Economic Development Cash Fund to award a grant relating to the federal Creating Helpful Incentives to Produce Semiconductors (CHIPS) for America Act
Title
Create the Economic Development Cash Fund to award a grant relating to the federal Creating Helpful Incentives to Produce Semiconductors (CHIPS) for America Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB617 amended into LB92 by AM1880 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-04-17 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2023-04-12 | Legislature | McDonnell AM1315 filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO727 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO724 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO728 Recommit to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO726 Recommit to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO723 Recommit to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO725 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO722 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 3 Section 3(f) filed |
2023-03-14 | Legislature | McDonnell priority bill |
2023-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2023 |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |