NE LB606 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for water augmentation projects and retention of water rights as prescribed
Title
Provide for water augmentation projects and retention of water rights as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Wayne MO42 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed |
2019-03-26 | Legislature | Wayne FA34 filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Groene priority bill |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37023 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB606.pdf |