NE LB605 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB605 amended into LB1107 by AM3316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB605 amended into LB1107 by AM3316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Renewable Chemical Production Tax Credit Act
Title
Adopt the Renewable Chemical Production Tax Credit Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB605 amended into LB1107 by AM3316 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB605 amended into LB720 by AM1614 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Wayne name withdrawn |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Williams name added |
2019-04-08 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 20, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Wishart name added |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | Moser name added |
2019-02-07 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Stinner name added |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Lowe name added |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37506 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB605.pdf |