NE LB600A | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - DeKay explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - DeKay explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | DeKay explanation of vote |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 16, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Lippincott AM3441 adopted |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Lippincott AM3441 filed |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-02-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-02-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2024-02-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Date of introduction |