NE LB6 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB6 amended into LB207 by AM507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for release of a summarized report by the office of Inspector General of Nebraska Child Welfare

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for release of a summarized report by the office of Inspector General of Nebraska Child Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB6 amended into LB207 by AM507
2017-05-23LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2017-05-23LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed
2017-05-17LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed
2017-01-27LegislatureExecutive Board AM38 filed
2017-01-27LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM38
2017-01-13LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 20, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback