NE LB599 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a minimum wage for certain young student workers
Title
Provide a minimum wage for certain young student workers
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Ebke [N] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-15 - Legislature - Failed on Final Reading 29-17-3 (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Failed on Final Reading 29-17-3 |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Riepe AM1461 withdrawn |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Hansen AM1281 withdrawn |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Hansen AM1296 withdrawn |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Crawford AM1348 withdrawn |
2015-05-01 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Riepe AM1461 filed |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Ebke MO96 prevailed |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Ebke MO96 Invoke cloture filed |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Nordquist AM1318 lost |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Nordquist AM1319 adopted |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Hansen MO95 withdrawn |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Hansen MO95 Reconsider the vote taken on AM1412 filed |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Kuehn AM1412 adopted |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Kuehn AM1412 pending |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Nordquist AM1319 pending |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER84 adopted |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Hansen AM1281 filed |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Hansen AM1296 filed |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Crawford AM1348 filed |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Kuehn AM1412 filed |
2015-04-22 | Legislature | Nordquist AM1318 filed |
2015-04-22 | Legislature | Nordquist AM1319 filed |
2015-04-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER84 filed |
2015-04-20 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER84 |
2015-04-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-04-15 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM526 adopted |
2015-04-15 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM526 pending |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Kuehn priority bill |
2015-03-03 | Legislature | Kuehn name added |
2015-03-02 | Legislature | Riepe name added |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Bloomfield name added |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Larson name added |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Davis name added |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Coash name added |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM526 filed |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM526 |
2015-02-26 | Legislature | Garrett name added |
2015-02-26 | Legislature | Stinner name added |
2015-02-26 | Legislature | Krist name added |
2015-02-26 | Legislature | Watermeier name added |
2015-02-10 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2015-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |