NE LB595 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for restorative justice under the Dispute Resolution Act, Nebraska Juvenile Code, and the Student Discipline Act and in compulsory attendance collaboration plans and change provisions relating to mediators under the Parenting Act
Title
Provide for restorative justice under the Dispute Resolution Act, Nebraska Juvenile Code, and the Student Discipline Act and in compulsory attendance collaboration plans and change provisions relating to mediators under the Parenting Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Albrecht AM1510 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1164 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Albrecht AM1510 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1164 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 13, 2019 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST20 |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Albrecht AM1510 adopted |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER95 adopted |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Albrecht AM1510 filed |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER95 filed |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER95 |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1164 adopted |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Wayne MO31 withdrawn |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1164 filed |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1164 |
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Wayne MO31 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |