NE LB594 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for a deceptive trade practice relating to meat under the Uniform Deceptive Trade Practices Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for a deceptive trade practice relating to meat under the Uniform Deceptive Trade Practices Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-13LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2020-01-16LegislaturePassed over
2020-01-15LegislatureBrewer MO118 pending
2020-01-15LegislatureBrewer MO118 Recommit to the Agriculture Committee filed
2020-01-15LegislatureAgriculture AM313 pending
2020-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2019-03-07LegislatureAgriculture AM313 filed
2019-03-07LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM313
2019-02-20LegislatureMurman name added
2019-01-31LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 19, 2019
2019-01-28LegislatureWalz name added
2019-01-25LegislatureDorn name added
2019-01-25LegislatureReferred to Agriculture Committee
2019-01-24LegislatureBrandt name added
2019-01-24LegislatureBriese name added
2019-01-24LegislatureWilliams name added
2019-01-23LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback