NE LB592 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB584 amended into LB592 by AM1359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB584 amended into LB592 by AM1359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to farm wineries under the Nebraska Liquor Control Act
Title
Change provisions relating to farm wineries under the Nebraska Liquor Control Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Slama AM1587 lost (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - General Affairs AM1359 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Slama AM1587 lost (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - General Affairs AM1359 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB584 amended into LB592 by AM1359 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER124 adopted |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER124 filed |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER124 |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Slama AM1587 lost |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | General Affairs AM1359 adopted |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Wayne MO37 withdrawn |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Slama AM1587 filed |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | General Affairs AM1359 filed |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1359 |
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Wayne MO37 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | General Affairs priority bill |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 25, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |