NE LB592 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to corrections and parole and mentally ill offenders
Title
Change provisions relating to corrections and parole and mentally ill offenders
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB592 amended into LB598 by AM928 |
2015-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 20, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |