NE LB589 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change requirements for integrated management plans by natural resources districts
Title
Change requirements for integrated management plans by natural resources districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |