NE LB589 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit peace officers from serving as school resource officers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit peace officers from serving as school resource officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-13LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2020-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2019-02-05LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 14, 2019
2019-01-25LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2019-01-23LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback