NE LB589 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for depositions of a child victim or child witness

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for depositions of a child victim or child witness

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-03-26LegislatureChambers FA137 pending
2018-03-26LegislatureChambers FA137 pending
2018-03-26LegislatureChambers FA137 filed
2018-03-26LegislatureCrawford AM1682 pending
2018-03-26LegislatureJudiciary AM438 adopted
2018-03-26LegislatureJudiciary AM438 pending
2018-03-26LegislatureChambers MO253 withdrawn
2018-03-26LegislatureCrawford AM2663 filed
2018-03-12LegislatureChambers MO253 pending
2018-03-12LegislatureChambers MO253 Reconsider the vote to recommit to committee filed
2018-03-12LegislatureChambers MO252 failed
2018-03-12LegislatureChambers MO252 Recommit to Judiciary Committee filed
2018-03-12LegislatureJudiciary AM438 pending
2018-03-12LegislatureJudiciary AM438 pending
2018-02-20LegislatureCrawford priority bill
2018-01-31LegislatureChambers FA95 filed
2018-01-31LegislatureCrawford AM1674 withdrawn
2018-01-31LegislatureCrawford AM1574 withdrawn
2018-01-31LegislatureJudiciary AM438 pending
2018-01-30LegislatureCrawford AM1682 filed
2018-01-26LegislatureWayne MO187 Indefinitely postpone filed
2018-01-26LegislatureCrawford AM1674 filed
2018-01-25LegislatureJudiciary AM438 pending
2018-01-23LegislatureCrawford AM1574 filed
2018-01-23LegislatureJudiciary AM438 pending
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-04-25LegislatureBlood name added
2017-03-13LegislatureJudiciary AM438 filed
2017-03-13LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM438
2017-03-01LegislatureBaker name added
2017-02-27LegislatureWatermeier name added
2017-02-07LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 02, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback