NE LB589 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Approved by Governor on May 24, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Approved by Governor on May 24, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allow for temporary use of state highways for special events as prescribed
Title
Allow for temporary use of state highways for special events as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Approved by Governor on May 24, 2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Presented to Governor on May 19, 2011 | |
2011-05-19 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-05-19 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 | |
2011-05-19 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on Final Reading with ST39 | |
2011-05-11 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-05-11 | Smith AM1408 adopted | |
2011-05-11 | Enrollment and Review ER103 adopted | |
2011-05-10 | Smith AM1408 filed | |
2011-04-28 | Enrollment and Review ER103 filed | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on Select File with ER103 | |
2011-04-27 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-04-27 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM858 adopted | |
2011-04-26 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM858 pending | |
2011-03-30 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM858 filed | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on General File with AM858 | |
2011-03-14 | Speaker priority bill | |
2011-02-07 | Notice of hearing for March 08, 2011 | |
2011-01-27 | Cook name added | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |