NE LB582 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Approved by Governor on February 12, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Approved by Governor on February 12, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to stolen firearms
Title
Change provisions relating to stolen firearms
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 12, 2020 |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 06, 2020 |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER143 adopted |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER143 filed |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER143 |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Brewer priority bill |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |