NE LB578 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Approved by Governor on May 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Ground Emergency Medical Transport Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Ground Emergency Medical Transport Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 22, 2017
2017-05-17LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 16, 2017
2017-05-16LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-16LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 41-0-8
2017-05-04LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-05-02LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-05-02LegislatureMcDonnell AM1262 adopted
2017-05-02LegislatureMcDonnell AM1262 filed
2017-05-02LegislatureMcDonnell AM1172 withdrawn
2017-05-02LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER63 adopted
2017-04-27LegislatureMcDonnell AM1172 filed
2017-04-19LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER63 filed
2017-04-19LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER63
2017-04-18LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-04-18LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM917 adopted
2017-04-11LegislatureBrewer name added
2017-04-11LegislatureWilliams name added
2017-04-10LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM917 filed
2017-04-10LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM917
2017-03-23LegislatureKolterman name added
2017-03-08LegislatureMcDonnell priority bill
2017-02-06LegislatureHilkemann name added
2017-02-03LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 15, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback