NE LB573 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to agreements under the Intergovernmental Risk Management Act
Title
Change provisions relating to agreements under the Intergovernmental Risk Management Act
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 18, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Brewer name withdrawn |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37453 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB573.pdf |