NE LB570A | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Howard AM1249 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Howard AM1206 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Howard AM1249 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Howard AM1206 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 13, 2019 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Howard AM1249 adopted |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER70 adopted |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Howard AM1249 filed |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER70 filed |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER70 |
2019-04-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-08 | Legislature | Howard AM1206 adopted |
2019-04-04 | Legislature | Howard AM1206 filed |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |