NE LB566 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB635 amended into LB566 by AM551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Interstate Wildlife Violator Compact and change other penalties and fines under the Game Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Interstate Wildlife Violator Compact and change other penalties and fines under the Game Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB635 amended into LB566 by AM551
2017-05-02LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 27, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 24, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-04-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 49-0-0
2017-04-24LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2017-04-05LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-04-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-03LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER24 adopted
2017-03-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER24 filed
2017-03-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER24
2017-03-22LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-03-22LegislatureNatural Resources AM551 adopted
2017-03-08LegislatureNatural Resources priority bill
2017-03-08LegislatureNatural Resources AM551 filed
2017-03-08LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM551
2017-01-24LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 08, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Natural Resources Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback