NE LB56 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change special designated licensure provisions under the Nebraska Liquor Control Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change special designated licensure provisions under the Nebraska Liquor Control Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12LegislatureApproved by Governor on March 07, 2019
2019-03-04LegislatureWayne explanation of vote
2019-03-01LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 01, 2019
2019-03-01LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2019-03-01LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 46-0-3
2019-02-19LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2019-02-11LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2019-02-05LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2019-02-01LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2019-01-30LegislaturePlaced on General File
2019-01-18LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 28, 2019
2019-01-14LegislatureReferred to General Affairs Committee
2019-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback