NE LB552 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB552 amended into LB254 by AM1461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change requirements for the Legislative Mental Health Care Capacity Strategic Planning Committee

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change requirements for the Legislative Mental Health Care Capacity Strategic Planning Committee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Legislature - Executive Board AM391 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB552 amended into LB254 by AM1461
2023-06-01LegislatureIndefinitely Postponed
2023-05-10LegislatureCavanaugh, M. AM1718 filed
2023-05-10LegislatureCavanaugh, M. AM1719 filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO639 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO636 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO640 Recommit to Executive Board filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO638 Recommit to Executive Board filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO635 Recommit to Executive Board filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO637 Indefinitely postpone filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO634 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed
2023-03-21LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER14 filed
2023-03-21LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER14
2023-03-16LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2023-03-16LegislatureExecutive Board AM391 adopted
2023-03-14LegislatureExecutive Board priority bill
2023-02-15LegislatureExecutive Board AM391 filed
2023-02-15LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM391
2023-01-25LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 03, 2023
2023-01-19LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2023-01-17LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=50755
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LB552.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM391.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/ER14.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO634.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO635.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO636.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO637.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO638.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO639.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO640.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM1719.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM1718.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/SI/LB552.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB552_20230202-095237.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/CS/LB552.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=8677
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=8678

Bill Comments

feedback