NE LB552 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clarify definitions relating to marijuana under the Uniform Controlled Substances Act and schedule nabiximols as a Schedule III controlled substance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarify definitions relating to marijuana under the Uniform Controlled Substances Act and schedule nabiximols as a Schedule III controlled substance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-20LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2022-01-05LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2021-02-04LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 19, 2021
2021-01-22LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-01-19LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback