NE LB55 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB172 amended into LB55 by AM191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB172 amended into LB55 by AM191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change powers of copersonal representatives, cotrustees, coguardians, and coconservators, change provisions relating to accounts with POD designations, and authorize persons eighteen years of age to acquire or convey title to real property and to enter into and execute related legal documents
Title
Change powers of copersonal representatives, cotrustees, coguardians, and coconservators, change provisions relating to accounts with POD designations, and authorize persons eighteen years of age to acquire or convey title to real property and to enter into and execute related legal documents
Sponsors
Sen. John Lowe [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 43-0-6 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Legislature - Pansing Brooks AM191 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Legislature - Judiciary AM47 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Legislature - Pansing Brooks AM191 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Legislature - Judiciary AM47 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB172 amended into LB55 by AM191 |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 01, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 43-0-6 |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-02-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER19 adopted |
2019-02-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER19 filed |
2019-02-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER19 |
2019-02-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-07 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM191 adopted |
2019-02-07 | Legislature | Judiciary AM47 adopted |
2019-02-06 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM191 filed |
2019-02-01 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2019-02-01 | Legislature | Judiciary AM47 filed |
2019-02-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM47 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |