NE LB549 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB549 amended into LB131 by AM751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB549 amended into LB131 by AM751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Aid to Municipalities Act
Title
Adopt the Aid to Municipalities Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB549 amended into LB131 by AM751 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM741 filed |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM741 |
2021-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 02, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |